U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00217
  • Case Name: Gardner-Hicks v. United States
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 26, 2022: [Rule 26 Disclosure Statement]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 24, 2022: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.