U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00103
  • Case Name: Patton v. Ferguson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Response to Habeas Petition]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 03, 2022: [Receipt of Non-Electronic Document]
  • October 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2022: [Return of Service]
  • September 09, 2022: [Return of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 25, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Case No Longer Referred]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.