U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00439
  • Case Name: Threlkeld v. Norton Healthcare Louisville
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Status Conference]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Status Conference]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Status Report]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 19, 2022: [Stay]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • October 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 25, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.