U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00440
  • Case Name: Cole v. Mariner Finance, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • December 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2022: [Compel]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 31, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 31, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 25, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.