U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00111
  • Case Name: Wolff et al v. Monsanto Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Remark (Public)]
  • September 19, 2022: [Case Transferred Out - District]
  • September 19, 2022: [Conditional Transfer Order - MDL]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • September 14, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 09, 2022: [Deficiency]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 26, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 26, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.