U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Lauderdale v. Brady et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 17, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 10, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Pro Hac Vice Renewal Payment]
  • October 07, 2024: [Invoice Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee - For PHV Clerk Only]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 06, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 26, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 26, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.