U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00119
  • Case Name: Granite State Insurance Company v. Taylor et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 22, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 13, 2023: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Docket Correction re:PDF]
  • December 28, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • December 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 22, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 19, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • December 16, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • December 15, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • December 13, 2022: [Counterclaim]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Rule 73 Notice of Magistrate Judges - Trial by Consent]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 28, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • October 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 26, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 26, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.