U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00118
  • Case Name: Maddox v. Equifax Information Services LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 30, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 26, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.