U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00441
  • Case Name: Castellanos-Peron v. Genius Trucking LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 03, 2022: [Rule 26 Disclosure Statement]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 26, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 26, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.