U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Rucker v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 27, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • October 27, 2022: [Remand]
  • October 27, 2022: [SSA Administrative Record]
  • October 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 07, 2022: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Social Security Case Assignment]
  • August 29, 2022: [SSA Notice of Service]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 29, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 29, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.