U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00101
  • Case Name: Sydnor et al v. Todd County Jail et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 22, 2022: [Memorandum]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • November 01, 2022: [Mail Returned]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 20, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 19, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • October 17, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Remark (Public)]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 29, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 29, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.