U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00444
  • Case Name: Green Applications, LLC v. J&J Industries, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Entry of Default]
  • January 11, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • October 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 18, 2022: [Counterclaim]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 29, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • August 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 29, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.