U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00446
  • Case Name: Domine et al v. Ghost City Tours of Kentucky, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 28, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 05, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 30, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 30, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 30, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.