U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00114
  • Case Name: Jackson v. C & B Marine, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Rule 73 Notice of Magistrate Judges - Trial by Consent]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 30, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 30, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.