U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00445
  • Case Name: Drury v. GLA Collection Co., Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Settlement]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 30, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 30, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.