U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Bowman v. Bowling Green City Independent School District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 12, 2023: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • January 05, 2023: [Report and Recommendations]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2022: [Objection]
  • December 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 22, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2022: [Supplement]
  • November 10, 2022: [Strike]
  • November 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • October 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2022: [Quash]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 30, 2022: [Complaint]
  • August 30, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.