U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00450
  • Case Name: Stone et al v. Dean Dairy Holdings, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Attachments]
  • September 28, 2022: [Docket Correction]
  • September 28, 2022: [Remand]
  • September 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 23, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 09, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 06, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Refer]
  • August 30, 2022: [Transfer Case]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 30, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 30, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.