U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00451
  • Case Name: Lawrence v. Bullitt County, Kentucky et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2022: [Status Report]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2022: [Suggestion of Death]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 24, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • October 04, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 04, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 03, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 12, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order Referring Motion - TEXT ONLY]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • September 01, 2022: [Expedite]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 31, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 31, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.