U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00455
  • Case Name: Harrison v. Carvana, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 19, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Remand]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 07, 2022: [Request for Fee Refund]
  • September 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 06, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
  • August 31, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.