U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00454
  • Case Name: Dixon v. Metz Culinary Management, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 28, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 21, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 31, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 31, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.