U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00457
  • Case Name: Clark v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2023: [Rule 26 Disclosure Statement]
  • January 04, 2023: [Rule 7.1(a)(2)Disclosure Statement - Diversity]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 19, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • November 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 14, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 31, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 31, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.