U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00122
  • Case Name: Jones v. TrueAccord Corp.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Schedules]
  • December 22, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 15, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Rule 73 Notice of Magistrate Judges - Trial by Consent]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 24, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 24, 2022: [Leave to]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • August 31, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • August 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 31, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.