U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00449
  • Case Name: Heath v. McCoy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Response]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Response]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Response]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 01, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.