U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00459
  • Case Name: Simpson v. Troyer Foods, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Stipulation]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • September 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 01, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.