U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00458
  • Case Name: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. The 21st Amendment Limited Liability Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Settlement]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 14, 2022: [Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement]
  • December 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 13, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Status Report]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice - US Patent & Trademark]
  • September 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 01, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 01, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.