U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00116
  • Case Name: CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Johnson Graham et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 03, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [Hearing]
  • October 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 10, 2022: [Counterclaim]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • September 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 01, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 01, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 01, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.