U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00462
  • Case Name: Structures USA, LLC v. Unifirst Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Ruling]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 21, 2022: [Remark (Public)]
  • October 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Stay]
  • October 20, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 06, 2022: [Ruling]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 05, 2022: [Entry of Default]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2022: [Docket Correction]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 02, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.