U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00461
  • Case Name: Ballard v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 16, 2023: [Brief]
  • January 16, 2023: [Fact/Law Summary]
  • January 11, 2023: [Schedules]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Social Security Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 25, 2022: [SSA Administrative Record]
  • October 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Social Security Case Assignment]
  • October 12, 2022: [SSA Notice of Service]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2022
  • September 03, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 02, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 02, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.