U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00468
  • Case Name: Kendrick v. Harrison et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.