U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00464
  • Case Name: Kaballah v. McKenzie
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Objection to Findings of Fact]
  • April 07, 2025: [Findings of Fact]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Leave to]
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • November 22, 2022: [Leave to]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Receipt of Non-Electronic Document]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 02, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 02, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • September 02, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.