U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00456
  • Case Name: Riggs et al v. Wright et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response to Motion]
November, 2024
  • November 29, 2024: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • November 19, 2024: [Reply]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Joinder]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2024: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Status Report]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Schedules]
  • January 04, 2023: [Mail Returned]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 15, 2022: [Response]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 06, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.