U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Marquette Transportation Company, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [Answer to Claim]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 02, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Stay]
  • October 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 31, 2022: [Claim]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • October 13, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 06, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.