U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00471
  • Case Name: Quadrant Magnetics, LLC et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 07, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to United States Attorney]
  • September 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Government Agency]
  • September 07, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 06, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.