U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00470
  • Case Name: Peters v. The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
  • September 06, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.