U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00463
  • Case Name: Ali v. Louisville Metro Housing Authority et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Telephone Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 16, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 07, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2022: [Supplement]
  • December 05, 2022: [Leave to]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • December 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 23, 2022: [Leave to]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • November 22, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 03, 2022: [Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 06, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 06, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 06, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.