U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00467
  • Case Name: Heath v. Spencer
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 07, 2022: [Response]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • November 02, 2022: [USCA Order]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Response]
  • October 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2022: [Response to Notice of Deficiency]
  • October 03, 2022: [Affidavit]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 27, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 07, 2022: [Receipt of Non-Electronic Document]
  • September 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.