U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00263
  • Case Name: Jackson v. United States et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 04, 2023: [Leave to]
  • January 04, 2023: [Set Aside]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • December 20, 2022: [Entry of Default]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.