U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00115
  • Case Name: Alford v. The Andersons, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 29, 2022: [Stay]
  • September 21, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 14, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 14, 2022: [Stay]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 07, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.