U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00119
  • Case Name: Frazier v. Warren County Sheriff's Dept. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 10, 2023: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • January 10, 2023: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 10, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 10, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 03, 2023: [USCA Case Number]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • December 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2022: [Response]
  • December 13, 2022: [Leave to]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 08, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 08, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 08, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.