U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00118
  • Case Name: Mitchell v. Econo Lodge Motel
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 16, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Response to Notice of Deficiency]
  • September 22, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 09, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 09, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 09, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.