U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00483
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Gonzalas et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Schedules]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 07, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 05, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Response to Notice of Deficiency]
  • September 16, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 16, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 16, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.