U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00485
  • Case Name: Hicks v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Schedules]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 11, 2023: [Brief]
  • January 11, 2023: [Fact/Law Summary]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Social Security Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 02, 2022: [SSA Administrative Record]
  • November 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Social Security Case Assignment]
  • October 12, 2022: [SSA Notice of Service]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 16, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 16, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.