U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00128
  • Case Name: Williams v. Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 17, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2022: [Response to Notice of Deficiency]
  • October 13, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 16, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 16, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 16, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 16, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 16, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.