U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00491
  • Case Name: Reece v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Fact/Law Summary]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 04, 2022: [Social Security Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [SSA Administrative Record]
  • November 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Social Security Case Assignment]
  • September 21, 2022: [SSA Notice of Service]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 19, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 19, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.