U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00490
  • Case Name: CitizensDx LLC v. Curis
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 27, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • November 02, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 19, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 19, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 19, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.