U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00494
  • Case Name: Cain v. Oldham County Board of Education et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 10, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • December 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 22, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 07, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 26, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 19, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 19, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.