U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00493
  • Case Name: Midwest Cabinet Suppliers, Inc. v. Verizon Wireless Services, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 17, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 16, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 27, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • December 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 11, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 11, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 11, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 10, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • October 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 19, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 19, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.