U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00498
  • Case Name: Brooks et al v. Thorntons LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • October 14, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • October 07, 2022: [Remand]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • September 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 21, 2022: [Crossclaim]
  • September 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 21, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 20, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 20, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.