U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00133
  • Case Name: Peach et al v. Hagerman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 04, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 02, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Stay]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Proposed Agreed Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order - TEXT ONLY]
  • September 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 20, 2022: [Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.