U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

kentucky Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-00496
  • Case Name: Howard v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 05, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Social Security Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [SSA Administrative Record]
  • November 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 26, 2022: [Deficiency]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Social Security Case Assignment]
  • September 21, 2022: [SSA Notice of Service]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2022: [Case Assignment]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.